This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 02/21/2022 at 10:13:29 (UTC).

CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC VS DANIELS, CATHY

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC filed an Other lawsuit against DANIELS, CATHY. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD and LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

DANIELS, CATHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, JONATHAN ROBERT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/28/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/28/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

10/28/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

10/28/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/28/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CATHY DANIELS

11/09/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CATHY DANIELS

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

01/04/2021:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

01/04/2021:CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY AS TO CATHY DANIELS

12/09/2021:AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY AS TO CATHY DANIELS

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/09/2021:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

EFILED UNSIGNED DEFAULT

12/10/2021:EFILED UNSIGNED DEFAULT

DEFAULT ENTERED

12/17/2021:DEFAULT ENTERED

AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM FILED BY PLTF CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC

12/22/2021:AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM FILED BY PLTF CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC

12/31/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC

MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC

12/31/2021:MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS FILED BY PLTF CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC

12/31/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS FILED BY PLTF CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC

REQUEST FOR COPIES COMPLETED

02/03/2022:REQUEST FOR COPIES COMPLETED

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES COMPLETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $13.00 Receipt Number XX 713874

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketAssessment 4 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS FILED BY PLTF CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM FILED BY PLTF CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 686092

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CC001465CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CKS Prime Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Singer, Jonathan Robert, ESQ.