This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 03/24/2019 at 23:31:25 (UTC).

CITIBANK NA VS TARTER, WILLIAM L

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 CITIBANK NA filed an Other lawsuit against TARTER, WILLIAM L. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK NA

Defendant

TARTER, WILLIAM L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL

Defendant Attorney

PERRY, RICHARD ALAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING FILED BY PLTF CITIBANK NA

12/27/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING FILED BY PLTF CITIBANK NA

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/20/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION FILED BY PLTF CITIBANK NA

11/21/2019:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION FILED BY PLTF CITIBANK NA

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/24/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

CERTIFICATE FILED BY THE PLAINTIFF CITIBANK NA

01/28/2020:CERTIFICATE FILED BY THE PLAINTIFF CITIBANK NA

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING FILED BY THE PLAINTIFF CITIBANK NA

01/28/2020:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING FILED BY THE PLAINTIFF CITIBANK NA

MEMORANDUM OF DISPOSITION AT HEARING

01/23/2020:MEMORANDUM OF DISPOSITION AT HEARING

AFFIDAVIT SUPPORTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF CITIBANK NA

12/27/2019:AFFIDAVIT SUPPORTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF CITIBANK NA

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

01/31/2020:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

MEMORANDUM OF DISPOSITION AT HEARING

10/23/2019:MEMORANDUM OF DISPOSITION AT HEARING

ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE

10/23/2019:ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLNTF CITIBANK

04/17/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLNTF CITIBANK

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLNTF CITIBANK

04/17/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLNTF CITIBANK

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/28/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS

02/28/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

02/28/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

PETITION/COMPLAINT

02/28/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY DEFT WILLIAM L TARTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 406629

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Case 422019CC000231CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 2/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less