This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/06/2019 at 23:32:20 (UTC).

CITIBANK NA VS BRENNAN, MARYANN D

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 CITIBANK NA filed an Other lawsuit against BRENNAN, MARYANN D. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK NA

Defendant

BRENNAN, MARYANN D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL

 

Court Documents

ANSWER FILED BY DEFT MARYANN D BRENNAN

05/06/2019:ANSWER FILED BY DEFT MARYANN D BRENNAN

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR MARYANN D BRENNAN

04/19/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR MARYANN D BRENNAN

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/09/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE-REFERENCE TO STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

10/22/2019:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE-REFERENCE TO STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

NOTICE-STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

10/15/2019:NOTICE-STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND CLOSING COURT FILE

10/22/2019:ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND CLOSING COURT FILE

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

03/13/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/13/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

03/13/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

PETITION/COMPLAINT

03/13/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 410943

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Case 422019CC000296CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 3/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less