This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/28/2020 at 22:36:28 (UTC).

CENTURION SYSTEMS LLC VS THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Case Summary

On 10/04/2020 CENTURION SYSTEMS LLC filed a Probate - Trust lawsuit against THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTURION SYSTEMS LLC

Defendant

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Not Classified By Court

TO JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONA

FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS SU

A NEW MEXICO LIMITED LIABILITY

LAND TRUST

CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005 8

NOT INDIVIDUALLY BUT SOLEY AS

STEARNS ALT A TRUST 2005 8 MOR

SUCCESSIR TRUSTEE UNDER THE 62

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEGAL, LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 569702

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2020
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2020
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2020
  • DocketCase 422020CA001587CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/4/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less