Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 11/04/2019 at 22:32:00 (UTC).

CENTERSTATE BANK NA VS ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 CENTERSTATE BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTERSTATE BANK NA

Defendants

ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC

TAMMY SLEETH DAVIS REVOCABLE T

UNKNOWN TENANT OCCUPANT 2

UNKNOWN TENANT OCCUPANT 1

DAVIS, TAMMY SLEETH

SLEETH & ASSOCIATES ACCOUNTING

Not Classified By Court

DAVIS REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MA

INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HICKS, DANIEL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1 NKA SLEETH & ASSOCIATES ACCOUNTING & TAX SERVICE

10/21/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1 NKA SLEETH & ASSOCIATES ACCOUNTING & TAX SERVICE

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

10/21/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT TAMMY SLEETH DAVIS

10/21/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT TAMMY SLEETH DAVIS

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

10/17/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR RODMAN WARD

10/15/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR RODMAN WARD

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

10/11/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/11/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/11/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/11/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED LIS PENDENS

10/11/2019:EFILED LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/11/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PETITION/COMPLAINT

10/11/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/11/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • UNKNOWN TENANT OCCUPANT 1 dismissed 10/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1 NKA SLEETH & ASSOCIATES ACCOUNTING & TAX SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT TAMMY SLEETH DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number XX 475065

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR RODMAN WARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Payment received: $440.00 Receipt Number XX 473388

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $440.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Case 422019CA002261CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE CHARLES P WALKER TRUST UAD MAY 10 1991 AS AMENDED is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTERSTATE BANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Asset Acceptance LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HICKS, DANIEL