This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 02:00:43 (UTC).

CEDARWOOD APARTMENTS II LTD VS HAMM, KELLY

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 CEDARWOOD APARTMENTS II LTD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HAMM, KELLY. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CEDARWOOD APARTMENTS II LTD

Defendant

HAMM, KELLY

Not Classified By Court

A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AS LANDL

CEDARWOOD APARTMENTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRETT, CHARLES VINCENT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO COUNT II WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF CEDARWOOD APARTMENTS II LTD

04/09/2019:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO COUNT II WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF CEDARWOOD APARTMENTS II LTD

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

01/30/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

01/30/2019:CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT

01/30/2019:ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT

ORDER

01/23/2019:ORDER

EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/10/2019:EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

MOTION- MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF CEDARWOOD APARTMENTS II LTD

01/10/2019:MOTION- MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF CEDARWOOD APARTMENTS II LTD

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY AND VERIFICATION OF PROOF OF CLAIM FILED BY PLTF CEDARWOOD APARTMENTS II LTD

01/10/2019:AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY AND VERIFICATION OF PROOF OF CLAIM FILED BY PLTF CEDARWOOD APARTMENTS II LTD

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR KELLY HAMM

01/10/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR KELLY HAMM

ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFT KELLY HAMM

01/09/2019:ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFT KELLY HAMM

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/08/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

01/03/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/03/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

01/03/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO COUNT II WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF CEDARWOOD APARTMENTS II LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF CEDARWOOD APARTMENTS II LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY AND VERIFICATION OF PROOF OF CLAIM FILED BY PLTF CEDARWOOD APARTMENTS II LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR KELLY HAMM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFT KELLY HAMM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 01/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number XX 388513

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Case 422019SC000058SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 1/3/2019

    Read MoreRead Less