This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 12:04:06 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS DENTON, VANESSA

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DENTON, VANESSA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT LANDT and LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT LANDT

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

DENTON, VANESSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TEAL, BROOKE ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

CLS: ORDER

04/16/2019:CLS: ORDER

JOINT STIPULATION FOR REPAYMENT

04/16/2019:JOINT STIPULATION FOR REPAYMENT

JUDGES WORKSHEET

04/16/2019:JUDGES WORKSHEET

JUDGES WORKSHEET

04/02/2019:JUDGES WORKSHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR VANESSA DENTON

02/18/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR VANESSA DENTON

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PETITION/COMPLAINT

01/29/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

01/29/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/29/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT STIPULATION FOR REPAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Event SC PTC scheduled on 04/16/2019 at 1230 PM - Judge ROBERT LANDT presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Event SC PTC scheduled on 05/21/2019 at 1230 PM - Judge ROBERT LANDT presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR VANESSA DENTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Active Process PTC disposition on 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Event SC PTC scheduled on 04/02/2019 at 1230 PM - Judge ROBERT LANDT presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 396814

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Case 422019SC000422SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 1/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Event Date: 05/21/2019 12:30; Judge: LANDT, ROBERT E; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: XX COURTROOM 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Event Date: 04/16/2019 12:30; Judge: LANDT, ROBERT E; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: XX COURTROOM 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Event Date: 04/02/2019 12:30; Judge: LANDT, ROBERT E; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: XX COURTROOM 1A

    Read MoreRead Less