This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 02/21/2022 at 11:25:43 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS BRACKEEN, JENNIFER A

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed an Other lawsuit against BRACKEEN, JENNIFER A. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III and THOMPSON, THOMAS P III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

BRACKEEN, JENNIFER A

Not Classified By Court

AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYERS, BREANNA NICOLE TIFFANY

Defendant Attorney

BROWN, MATTHEW STEWART

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/16/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW COMPLAINT

11/16/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

11/16/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW

11/16/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT JENNIFER BRACKEEN

11/26/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT JENNIFER BRACKEEN

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JENNIFER A BRACKEEN

11/29/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JENNIFER A BRACKEEN

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY JENNIFER BRACKEEN

12/08/2021:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY JENNIFER BRACKEEN

MOTION-MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLTF COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT JENNIFER BRACKEEN

12/15/2021:MOTION-MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLTF COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT JENNIFER BRACKEEN

AGREED ORDER ON DEFTS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS COMPLAINT

01/05/2022:AGREED ORDER ON DEFTS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS COMPLAINT

MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT JENNIFER A BRACKEEN

01/31/2022:MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT JENNIFER A BRACKEEN

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY DEFT JENNIFER A BRACKEEN

02/17/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY DEFT JENNIFER A BRACKEEN

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY DEFT JENNIFER A BRACKEEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT JENNIFER A BRACKEEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER ON DEFTS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION-MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLTF COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT JENNIFER BRACKEEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY JENNIFER BRACKEEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JENNIFER A BRACKEEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT JENNIFER BRACKEEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 691249

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CC001542CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/16/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where as assignee of Citibank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAYERS, BREANNA NICOLE TIFFANY