This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 05/09/2019 at 23:31:36 (UTC).

CASCADE CAPITAL LLC VS SINK, MONICA Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 CASCADE CAPITAL LLC filed an Other lawsuit against SINK, MONICA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASCADE CAPITAL LLC

Defendants

WROBEL, DENISE JENNIFER

SINK, MONICA

WROBEL, DENISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORR, DAVID DYLAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE-NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF CASCADE CAPITAL LLC

02/05/2020:NOTICE-NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF CASCADE CAPITAL LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DENISE WROBEL

04/26/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DENISE WROBEL

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

04/15/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/15/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/15/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

04/15/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/15/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DENISE WROBEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Payment received: $320.00 Receipt Number XX 421314

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Case 422019CC000450CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less