This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/23/2021 at 08:15:44 (UTC).

CARVER, JODI LAWSON VS NELSON TREE SERVICE LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 CARVER, JODI LAWSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NELSON TREE SERVICE LLC. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM and HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARVER, JODI LAWSON

Defendants

VARELA BRITO, YUSIEL IGNACIO

NELSON TREE SERVICE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, MICHAEL JAMES

Defendant Attorney

FINA, WESLEY DAVID

 

Court Documents

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF JODI LAWSON CARVER

07/13/2021:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF JODI LAWSON CARVER

REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF JODI LAWSON CARVER

06/16/2021:REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF JODI LAWSON CARVER

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

06/15/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT NELSON TREE SERVICE FILED BY PLTF JODI LAWSON CARVER

06/11/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT NELSON TREE SERVICE FILED BY PLTF JODI LAWSON CARVER

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF JODI LAWSON CARVER

06/11/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF JODI LAWSON CARVER

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF JODI LAWSON CARVER

06/11/2021:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF JODI LAWSON CARVER

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT NELSON TREE SERVICE LLC

05/27/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT NELSON TREE SERVICE LLC

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFTS YUSIEL IGNACIO VARELA BRITO AND NELSON TREE SERVICE LLC

05/26/2021:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFTS YUSIEL IGNACIO VARELA BRITO AND NELSON TREE SERVICE LLC

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

05/26/2021:ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF JODI LAWSON CARVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number XX 661506

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF JODI LAWSON CARVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF JODI LAWSON CARVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT NELSON TREE SERVICE FILED BY PLTF JODI LAWSON CARVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA000317CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 2/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NELSON TREE SERVICE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fina, Wesley David