Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 06/11/2021 at 22:46:23 (UTC).

CARTER, STEPHEN B W VS MECHANIC REHAB LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 CARTER, STEPHEN B W filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MECHANIC REHAB LLC. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM and HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARTER, STEPHEN B W

Defendants

MECHANIC REHAB LLC

TRUCH, MARK

TRUCH, JONI

Not Classified By Court

A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAINZ, ROBERT RYAN

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO RESPOND AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE

07/14/2021:ORDER TO RESPOND AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE

MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2516 FILED BY DEFTS MARK TRUCH JONI TRUCH AND MECHANIC REHAB LLC

06/15/2021:MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2516 FILED BY DEFTS MARK TRUCH JONI TRUCH AND MECHANIC REHAB LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT JONI TRUCH

05/31/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT JONI TRUCH

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT MECHANIC REHAB LLC

05/31/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT MECHANIC REHAB LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT MARK TRUCH

05/31/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT MARK TRUCH

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

05/18/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/18/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/18/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

05/18/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

05/18/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

05/18/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

05/18/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

05/18/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/18/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT JONI TRUCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT MECHANIC REHAB LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT MARK TRUCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number XX 638941

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA000923CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer R RYAN SAINZ