This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 06/10/2019 at 21:30:17 (UTC).

CARRIAGE HOUSE PARTNERS LLC VS CALKINS, KRISTINA Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 CARRIAGE HOUSE PARTNERS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CALKINS, KRISTINA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, THOMAS P III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRIAGE HOUSE PARTNERS LLC

Defendants

CALKINS, KRISTINA

TOMPKINS, JERRY

Not Classified By Court

DBA CARRIAGE HOUSE TOWNHOMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOLK, BRIAN PETER

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JERRY TOMPKINS

05/30/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JERRY TOMPKINS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR KRISTINA CALKINS

05/30/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR KRISTINA CALKINS

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND VACATING FINAL JUDGMENT IF APPLICABLE

05/29/2019:ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND VACATING FINAL JUDGMENT IF APPLICABLE

MOTION- STIPULATION

05/23/2019:MOTION- STIPULATION

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/22/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

05/17/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

05/17/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE

05/17/2019:CERTIFICATE

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

05/17/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

05/17/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JERRY TOMPKINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR KRISTINA CALKINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND VACATING FINAL JUDGMENT IF APPLICABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Payment received: $205.00 Receipt Number XX 431459

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Case 422019SC002563SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less