This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/21/2019 at 23:32:41 (UTC).

CANOVA, LINDA VS WILLIS, AMY

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 CANOVA, LINDA filed an Other lawsuit against WILLIS, AMY. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANOVA, LINDA

Defendant

WILLIS, AMY

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

04/11/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

CORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM FILED BY DEFT AMY WILLIS

04/10/2019:CORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM FILED BY DEFT AMY WILLIS

CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION UNLAWFUL DETAINER

04/09/2019:CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION UNLAWFUL DETAINER

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

04/09/2019:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

04/09/2019:PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

04/08/2019:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT AMY WILLIS

04/03/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT AMY WILLIS

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

03/28/2019:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

DEED- WARRANTY

03/28/2019:DEED- WARRANTY

EVICTION NOTICE-7 DAYS

03/28/2019:EVICTION NOTICE-7 DAYS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

03/28/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM FILED BY DEFT AMY WILLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT AMY WILLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT-FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEED- WARRANTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION NOTICE-7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 415241

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Case 422019CC000361CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less