This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 07/31/2021 at 21:39:25 (UTC).

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION VS GEIGER, CHRISTOPHER M

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEIGER, CHRISTOPHER M. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCCUNE, ROBERT JAMES JR, MCCUNE, R JAMES and R MCCUNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCCUNE, ROBERT JAMES JR

MCCUNE, R JAMES

R MCCUNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION

Defendant

GEIGER, CHRISTOPHER M

Ocala, FL 34480

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REISS, JENNIFER L

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/15/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

07/07/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/07/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/07/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/07/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 08/24/2021 13:00; Judge: MCCUNE, R JAMES; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER TO BE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent SC PTC scheduled on 08/24/2021 at 0100 PM - Judge R MCCUNE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 653070

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCase 422021SC002962SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 7/7/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REISS JENNIFER L