Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 04/15/2021 at 22:06:11 (UTC).

CALIBER HOME LOANS INC VS KAYL, JOHN L Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 CALIBER HOME LOANS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KAYL, JOHN L. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCOTT, EDWARD L and SCOTT, EDWARD LEON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCOTT, EDWARD L

SCOTT, EDWARD LEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIBER HOME LOANS INC

Defendants

OAK HILL PLANTATION HOMEOWNERS

KAYL, JOHN L

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN L KAYL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHOUSIS, JULIE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/12/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/12/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/12/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

04/08/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/08/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/08/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF FILING

04/08/2021:NOTICE OF FILING

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

04/08/2021:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

04/08/2021:EFILED LIS PENDENS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/08/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/08/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $935.00 Receipt Number XX 626175

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $935.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA000660CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Caliber Home Loans, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthousis, Julie