This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/24/2022 at 22:38:52 (UTC).

CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC. VS ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2022 CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC.

Defendants

ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES

CHALLANCIN, KIMBERLY JOYCE

Unknown Spouse of Kimberly Joy

United States of America

JOHNSON, KENT A.

Marion County, Florida

Midland Funding LLC

Unknown Tenants In Possession

Not Classified By Court

INCLUDING IF A NAMED DEFENDANT

PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES THE S

HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES CREDIT

PARITES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UN

DEFENDANT AND ALL CLAIMANTS PE

NATURAL OR CORPORATE OR WHOSE

IS UNKNOWN CLAIMING UNDER ANY

OR DESCRIBED DEFENDANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSALER, BRIAN LEE

Defendant Attorney

HARRIS, WILLIAM A.

 

Court Documents

DISCLAIMER BY CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

11/17/2022:DISCLAIMER BY CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

11/10/2022:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

11/10/2022:ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

11/08/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

11/07/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

11/07/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

RECEIPT FILING FEES

11/01/2022:RECEIPT FILING FEES

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/01/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/01/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/01/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/01/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/01/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/01/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

10/31/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/31/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/31/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/31/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/31/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLAIMER BY CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FILING FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $975.00 Receipt Number XX 793981

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketFiler Selected Confidentiality Flag: . NoConfidentialInformation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $975.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA002286CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less