This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/22/2022 at 22:33:55 (UTC).

CALIBER HOME LOANS INC VS ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 CALIBER HOME LOANS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIBER HOME LOANS INC

Defendants

ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES

Unknown Spouse of Roberto Vent

Unknown Tenants in Possession

VENTURA, ROBERTO JR

Not Classified By Court

INCLUDING IF A NAMED DEFENDANT

PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES THE S

HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES CREDIT

PARITES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UN

DEFENDANT AND ALL CLAIMANTS PE

NATURAL OR CORPORATE OR WHOSE

IS UNKNOWN CLAIMING UNDER ANY

OR DESCRIBED DEFENDANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSALER, BRIAN LEE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/29/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

07/29/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/29/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

07/29/2022:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

07/29/2022:EFILED LIS PENDENS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/29/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/29/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION NUMBER 1

08/10/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION NUMBER 1

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION NUMBER 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $925.00 Receipt Number XX 767010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $925.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA001547CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 7/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less