This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/15/2020 at 22:33:07 (UTC).

CALDER, LISA VS BANK OF AMERICA NA Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 CALDER, LISA filed an Other lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA NA. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCOTT, EDWARD L and SCOTT, EDWARD LEON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCOTT, EDWARD L

SCOTT, EDWARD LEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALDER, LISA

Defendants

MARION COUNTY CLERK OF CIRCUIT

WOODALL, VAUGHN EDWARD

MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

HALLEY, TAMMI

BANK OF AMERICA NA

RAMSEY, TERESA

MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

WOODALL, DENISE

Not Classified By Court

A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE

ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF FLOR

A FLORIDA CORPORATION

AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF

DBA MUNROE REGIONAL MEDICAL CE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOODING, W JAMES

Defendant Attorney

HARRELL, GREGORY CARTER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/23/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

10/23/2020:PETITION/COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLTF LISA CALDER

10/27/2020:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLTF LISA CALDER

EFILED SUMMONS

10/30/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/30/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/30/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/30/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/30/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/30/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/30/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/30/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/30/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/30/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

ANSWER FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT

11/04/2020:ANSWER FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT

NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED ACCEPTANCES OF SERVICES OF PROCESS

11/05/2020:NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED ACCEPTANCES OF SERVICES OF PROCESS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED ACCEPTANCES OF SERVICES OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $50.00 Receipt Number XX 577820

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLTF LISA CALDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $415.00 Receipt Number XX 575683

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $415.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCase 422020CA001722CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less