This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/18/2023 at 21:18:55 (UTC).

BRYDEN, ROBIN VS GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 BRYDEN, ROBIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRYDEN, ROBIN

Defendants

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE

TRES JOLIE ART INC

TESMER, VICKY

Not Classified By Court

A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLENZ, THOMAS PATRICK

Defendant Attorney

BAKER, AARON ROBERT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/04/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

11/04/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

11/04/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/04/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/04/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

11/04/2022:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

11/04/2022:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/04/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/04/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

11/08/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

11/08/2022:ORDER GRANTING MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY VICKY TESMER AND TRES JOLIE ART INC

12/05/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY VICKY TESMER AND TRES JOLIE ART INC

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF ROBIN BRYDEN

03/28/2023:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF ROBIN BRYDEN

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF ROBIN BRYDEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY VICKY TESMER AND TRES JOLIE ART INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022

DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number XX 795514

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketFiler Selected Confidentiality Flag: . NoConfidentialInformation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketCase 422022CA002328CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/4/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less