This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 05/22/2019 at 22:30:53 (UTC).

BRYAN, WILLIS GRACIN JR VS SCHOOL BOARD OF MARION COUNTY

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 BRYAN, WILLIS GRACIN JR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SCHOOL BOARD OF MARION COUNTY. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERNDON, LISA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERNDON, LISA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRYAN, WILLIS GRACIN JR

Defendant

SCHOOL BOARD OF MARION COUNTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUSLEH, KELLY H

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT SCHOOL BOARD OF MARION COUNTY

07/10/2020:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT SCHOOL BOARD OF MARION COUNTY

NOTICE OF PARTIAL COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT SCHOOL BOARD OF MARION COUNTY

04/06/2020:NOTICE OF PARTIAL COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT SCHOOL BOARD OF MARION COUNTY

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION FILED BY DEFT

06/17/2020:CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION FILED BY DEFT

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT SCHOOL BOARD OF MARION COUNTY

07/22/2020:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT SCHOOL BOARD OF MARION COUNTY

NOTICE OF PARTIAL COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT SCHOOL BOARD OF MARION COUNTY

07/22/2020:NOTICE OF PARTIAL COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT SCHOOL BOARD OF MARION COUNTY

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/29/2020:AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF PARTIAL COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT SCHOOL BOARD OF MARION COUNTY

07/24/2020:NOTICE OF PARTIAL COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT SCHOOL BOARD OF MARION COUNTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

09/09/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION FILED BY DEFT SCHOOL BOARD OF MARION COUNTY

04/21/2020:CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION FILED BY DEFT SCHOOL BOARD OF MARION COUNTY

EFILED SUMMONS

06/06/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

01/21/2020:CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

06/02/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF NON OBJECTION TO DEFTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY AND REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF WILLIS GRACIN BRYAN JR

01/16/2020:NOTICE OF NON OBJECTION TO DEFTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY AND REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF WILLIS GRACIN BRYAN JR

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY PLTF WILLIS GRACIN BRYANT JR

05/01/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY PLTF WILLIS GRACIN BRYANT JR

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/29/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/29/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT SCHOOL BOARD OF MARION COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLTF WILLIS GRACIN BRYAN JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Payment received: $20.00 Receipt Number XX 430370

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY PLTF WILLIS GRACIN BRYANT JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number XX 425314

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Case 422019CA000939CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less