This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 14:20:41 (UTC).

BRUMAIRE FLORENCE, CHRISLYNE I VS HARRINGTON, RASHAWD JAMES Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2019 BRUMAIRE FLORENCE, CHRISLYNE I filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARRINGTON, RASHAWD JAMES. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, THOMAS P III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRUMAIRE FLORENCE, CHRISLYNE I

Defendants

HARRINGTON, RASHAWD JAMES

ROBINSON, LETHA

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

04/02/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

04/02/2019:CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

03/28/2019:PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

03/28/2019:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

03/28/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT LETHA ROBINSON

03/28/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT LETHA ROBINSON

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT JAMES HARRIGNTON SUB SERVICE

03/25/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT JAMES HARRIGNTON SUB SERVICE

CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

03/18/2019:CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

03/15/2019:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- EMAIL

03/15/2019:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- EMAIL

EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

03/15/2019:EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

03/15/2019:EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

03/15/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT LETHA ROBINSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Payment received: $0.15 Receipt Number XX 415376

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Assessment 5 assessed at sum $0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT JAMES HARRIGNTON SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Payment received: $220.00 Receipt Number XX 411632

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Assessment 4 assessed at sum $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Case 422019SC001247SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less