This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 05/22/2019 at 22:31:57 (UTC).

BROWN, ISMOSE VS BURTENSHAW, DEREK W

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 BROWN, ISMOSE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BURTENSHAW, DEREK W. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN, ISMOSE

Defendant

BURTENSHAW, DEREK W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROCKWAY, PAUL BRUCE

 

Court Documents

CLS: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF ISMOSE BROWN

06/20/2019:CLS: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF ISMOSE BROWN

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT DEREK W BURTENSHAW

05/14/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT DEREK W BURTENSHAW

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/29/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/29/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/29/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

04/29/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

04/29/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/29/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/29/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/29/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT DEREK W BURTENSHAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 425132

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Case 422019CA000936CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less