This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/18/2022 at 22:50:55 (UTC).

BRADLEY, TERRANCE VS BERG, STEPHEN JOHN Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 BRADLEY, TERRANCE filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against BERG, STEPHEN JOHN. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN and ROGERS, STEVEN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

ROGERS, STEVEN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRADLEY, TERRANCE

Defendants

MENNING, KEVIN MICHAEL

BERG, STEPHEN JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIANNA, MISTY MORGAN

Defendant Attorney

ROE, MICHAEL A

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

11/15/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

11/15/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

11/15/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

11/15/2022:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

REPLY TO AFFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF TERRANCE BRADLEY

11/14/2022:REPLY TO AFFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF TERRANCE BRADLEY

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT KEBIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

11/09/2022:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT KEBIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING

11/06/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

11/03/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

MOTION-MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

11/03/2022:MOTION-MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

11/03/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/26/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/26/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

10/25/2022:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

10/25/2022:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/25/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/25/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/25/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/25/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF TERRANCE BRADLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT KEBIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION-MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFTS KEVIN MICHAEL MENNING AND STEPHEN JOHN BERG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketFiler Selected Confidentiality Flag: . NoConfidentialInformation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA002239CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIANNA , MISTY MORGAN