Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 02/11/2021 at 00:28:06 (UTC).

BIDERMAN, BERNARD VS HARBOR HOUSE ALF LLC

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 BIDERMAN, BERNARD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HARBOR HOUSE ALF LLC. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HODGES, ROBERT W and HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HODGES, ROBERT W

HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIDERMAN, BERNARD

Defendants

HARBOR HOUSE ALF LLC

RSC DUNNELLON HARBOR LLC

THE HARBOR HOUSE AT OCALA LLC

PRIORITY LIFE CARE LLC

Not Classified By Court

DBA HARBOR HOUSE OF OCALA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLAPPERT, STANLEY W

Defendant Attorneys

TURNER, CHRISTA COWART

LARGUIER, MARGARET JABOUR

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT THE HARBOR HOUSE AT OCALA LLC

01/29/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT THE HARBOR HOUSE AT OCALA LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/17/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/15/2020:ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

MEDIATION REPORT

12/15/2020:MEDIATION REPORT

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

11/03/2020:STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE AMENDED

08/20/2020:NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE AMENDED

MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF BERNARD BIDERMAN

08/19/2020:MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF BERNARD BIDERMAN

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE CONT SEE DOC

08/10/2020:ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE CONT SEE DOC

ANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE TO PLTFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FILED BY DEFT HARBOR HOUSE ALF LLC

06/30/2020:ANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE TO PLTFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FILED BY DEFT HARBOR HOUSE ALF LLC

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF BERNARD BIDERMAN

05/26/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF BERNARD BIDERMAN

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

05/20/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL

05/04/2020:ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT HARBOR HOUSE ALF LLC

04/30/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT HARBOR HOUSE ALF LLC

MOTION-MOTION TO STRIKE DEFTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF BERNARD BIDERMAN

04/03/2020:MOTION-MOTION TO STRIKE DEFTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF BERNARD BIDERMAN

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF BERNARD BIDERMAN

01/16/2020:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF BERNARD BIDERMAN

DEFAULT ENTERED

01/06/2020:DEFAULT ENTERED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT HARBOR HOUSE ALF LLC

12/30/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT HARBOR HOUSE ALF LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT THE HARBOR HOUSE AT OCALA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFT THE HARBOR HOUSE AT OCALA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $20.00 Receipt Number XX 591060

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAssessment 5 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 473520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA002264CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LARGUIER , MARGARET JABOUR

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TURNER, CHRISTA COWART