This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 05/24/2019 at 22:31:44 (UTC).

BETANCES, GERMAN VS SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMP

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 BETANCES, GERMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMP. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BETANCES, GERMAN

Defendant

SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMP

Not Classified By Court

A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TUCKER, CHARLES R

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

02/06/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

01/29/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF GERMAN BETANCES

01/10/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF GERMAN BETANCES

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF GERMAN BETANCES

01/10/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF GERMAN BETANCES

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF GERMAN BETANCES

01/10/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF GERMAN BETANCES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY THE PLAINTIFF GERMAN BETANCES

01/06/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY THE PLAINTIFF GERMAN BETANCES

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY THE PLAINTIFF GERMAN BETANCES

01/06/2020:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY THE PLAINTIFF GERMAN BETANCES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

10/17/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

06/19/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLTF GERMAN BETANCES

08/30/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLTF GERMAN BETANCES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/10/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFT SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

08/27/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFT SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFT SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

08/27/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFT SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

08/23/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

04/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/30/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/30/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 425805

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Case 422019CA000948CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less