This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/18/2023 at 20:58:43 (UTC).

BENNETT, NAZINGA Et Al VS CHOQUET, MARTINE

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 BENNETT, NAZINGA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHOQUET, MARTINE. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BENNETT, NAZINGA

BENNETT, RAY

Defendant

CHOQUET, MARTINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAPY, NICOLA PERNICIARO

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT MARTINE CHOQUET

10/03/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT MARTINE CHOQUET

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT MARTINE CHOQUET

10/03/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT MARTINE CHOQUET

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT MARTINE CHOQUET

10/03/2023:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT MARTINE CHOQUET

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT MARTINE CHOQUET

10/03/2023:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT MARTINE CHOQUET

ORDER ON MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

08/15/2023:ORDER ON MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

08/15/2023:ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY PLTF NAZINGA BENNETT AND RAY BENNETT

08/15/2023:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY PLTF NAZINGA BENNETT AND RAY BENNETT

MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS FILED BY PLTF NAZINGA BENNETT AND RAY BENNETT

08/15/2023:MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS FILED BY PLTF NAZINGA BENNETT AND RAY BENNETT

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/02/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

EXHIBIT C

08/01/2023:EXHIBIT C

EXHIBIT B

08/01/2023:EXHIBIT B

EXHIBIT A

08/01/2023:EXHIBIT A

AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT

08/01/2023:AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

08/01/2023:EFILED SUMMONS

ORDER ON MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

05/11/2023:ORDER ON MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFT MARTINE CHOQUET FILED BY PLTF

05/10/2023:MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFT MARTINE CHOQUET FILED BY PLTF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY AND SUBSTITUTION OF LEAD ATTORNEY AND EMAIL DESIGNATION FILED BY PLTFS NAZINGA AND RAY BENNETT

05/10/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY AND SUBSTITUTION OF LEAD ATTORNEY AND EMAIL DESIGNATION FILED BY PLTFS NAZINGA AND RAY BENNETT

ORDER GRANTING MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

11/08/2022:ORDER GRANTING MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT MARTINE CHOQUET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT MARTINE CHOQUET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT MARTINE CHOQUET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT MARTINE CHOQUET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER ON MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY PLTF NAZINGA BENNETT AND RAY BENNETT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS FILED BY PLTF NAZINGA BENNETT AND RAY BENNETT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023

DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number XX 875659

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketFiler Selected Confidentiality Flag: . NoConfidentialInformation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 795197

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketCase 422022CA002320CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/4/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less