This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 09/11/2020 at 21:33:39 (UTC).

BELLO, BILL VS ELLIS, AMANDA

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 BELLO, BILL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ELLIS, AMANDA. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LANDT, ROBERT E and LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LANDT, ROBERT E

LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELLO, BILL

Defendant

ELLIS, AMANDA

 

Court Documents

PETITION/COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

08/18/2020:PETITION/COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

EVICTION NOTICE-15 DAYS

08/18/2020:EVICTION NOTICE-15 DAYS

EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

08/18/2020:EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET EMAIL

08/18/2020:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET EMAIL

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

08/18/2020:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/18/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

08/18/2020:CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT AMANDA ELLIS

08/24/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT AMANDA ELLIS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

08/28/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

08/28/2020:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

AFFIDAVIT OF DEMAND FILED BY PLTF

08/28/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF DEMAND FILED BY PLTF

PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

08/28/2020:PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

08/28/2020:RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

CORR/MEMO- CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE FILED BY DEFT AMANDA ELLIS

08/28/2020:CORR/MEMO- CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE FILED BY DEFT AMANDA ELLIS

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

08/28/2020:DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

JUDGES WORKSHEET

11/02/2020:JUDGES WORKSHEET

ORDER SETTING HEARING EVICTIONS STATUS HEARING VIA ZOOM

10/13/2020:ORDER SETTING HEARING EVICTIONS STATUS HEARING VIA ZOOM

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

10/30/2020:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORR/MEMO- CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE FILED BY DEFT AMANDA ELLIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $1.00 Receipt Number XX 559749

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 7 assessed at sum $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $1,428.50 Receipt Number XX 559744

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 6 assessed at sum $28.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 5 assessed at sum $1,400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DEMAND FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE INFORMATION SHEET EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION NOTICE-15 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $202.00 Receipt Number XX 556825

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCase 422020SC002690SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 08/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less