This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 05/23/2019 at 23:32:21 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE VS BARR, PETER G

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed an Other lawsuit against BARR, PETER G. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

BARR, PETER G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVIN, DESIREE MARIA

 

Court Documents

CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

03/20/2020:CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

03/16/2020:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

03/16/2020:CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

03/20/2020:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

MOTION-MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

02/12/2020:MOTION-MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

11/06/2019:CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING FILED BY PLTF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

11/04/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING FILED BY PLTF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF FILED BY PLTF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

11/04/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF FILED BY PLTF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

11/04/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

DEFAULT ENTERED

07/08/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED

EFILED UNSIGNED DEFAULT

07/03/2019:EFILED UNSIGNED DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY PLTF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

07/03/2019:AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY PLTF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

07/03/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

EFILED SUMMONS

04/29/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

04/29/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

SUPPLEMENTAL NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

04/29/2019:SUPPLEMENTAL NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/29/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/29/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR PETER G BARR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 425394

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Case 422019CC000527CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less