This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/10/2020 at 22:42:05 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST VS CLERK OF COURT OF MARION COUNT Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CLERK OF COURT OF MARION COUNT. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM and HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST

Defendants

SPRUCE CREEK GOLF AND COUNTRY

CLERK OF COURT OF MARION COUNT

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIE

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

MICHAEL, THOMAS

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF

Not Classified By Court

ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF

DEVELOPMENT

AS TRUSTEE FOR MORTGAGE ASSETS

SERIES I TRUST

OTHER WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTERES

ASSOCIATION INC

JAMES I MICHAEL DECEASED

ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

Defendant Attorney

HARRELL, GREGORY CARTER

 

Court Documents

ANSWER FILED BY DEFT CLERK OF COURT MARION COUNTY FL

12/01/2020:ANSWER FILED BY DEFT CLERK OF COURT MARION COUNTY FL

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/18/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/18/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/18/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/18/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/18/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/18/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

11/16/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/16/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/16/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/16/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/16/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/16/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

11/16/2020:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE

11/16/2020:CERTIFICATE

EFILED LIS PENDENS

11/16/2020:EFILED LIS PENDENS

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

11/16/2020:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/16/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY DEFT CLERK OF COURT MARION COUNTY FL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $967.50 Receipt Number XX 582736

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $967.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCase 422020CA001827CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/16/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less