This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 07/07/2019 22:30:43

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 a Property - Foreclosure case was filed by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST against ANNESHENSLEY, MARK in the jurisdiction of Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number ****************AXXX
  • Filing Date 06/13/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Property - Foreclosure
  • Jurisdiction Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County
  • Judge SCOTT, EDWARD L
  • Courthouse Marion County Judicial Center
  • County Marion
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Defendant ANNESHENSLEY, STEPHEN
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST
  • Represented By
    • COHEN, LINDSAY BRAKEFIELD
  • Defendant MARION COUNTY FLORIDA
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Not Yet Classified DEVELOPMENT
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Not Yet Classified ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HO
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Not Yet Classified TRUST
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant THE UNKNOWN HEIRS GRANTEES ASS
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant UNKNOWN PARTY 4
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant ANNESHENSLEY, MARK
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant SPRUCE CREEK RECREATION LLC
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS ISSUED

06/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS ISSUED

06/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS ISSUED

06/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS ISSUED

06/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS ISSUED

06/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY, FLORIDA
  • 06/26/2019
  • ANSWER FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY, FLORIDA
  • 06/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT FILED BY PLTF BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED
  • 06/14/2019
  • Payment received: $1,010.00 Receipt Number XX 439149
  • 06/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned
  • 06/13/2019
  • EFILED LIS PENDENS
  • 06/13/2019
  • EFILED SUMMONS
  • 06/13/2019
  • EFILED SUMMONS
  • 06/13/2019
  • EFILED SUMMONS
  • 06/13/2019
  • EFILED SUMMONS
  • 06/13/2019
  • EFILED SUMMONS

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.