This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/23/2019 at 22:32:54 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2019 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERNDON, LISA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERNDON, LISA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendants

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF AMERICA I

GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

UNKNOWN TENANT 1 IN POSSESSION

HIDDEN LAKE SUBDIVISION PROPER

UNKNOWN TENANT 2 IN POSSESSION

MAHAN, JOHNNIE L

MURRAY, JOANNE M

Not Classified By Court

DBA GTE FINANCIAL

ON BEHALF OF SECRETA,

FKA SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVI

AS ISSUER FOR LOAN TRUSTEE FOR

MURRAY, AKA JOANNE

TRUST 2016 A

AS SERVICER FOR ASF WILMINGTON

ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COURNOYER, DEREK RAYMOND

 

Court Documents

ANSWER FILED BY DEFT GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

06/17/2019:ANSWER FILED BY DEFT GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT HIDDEN LAKE SUBDIVISION PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

06/13/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT HIDDEN LAKE SUBDIVISION PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT HIDDEN LAKE SUBDIVISION PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

06/13/2019:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT HIDDEN LAKE SUBDIVISION PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

05/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

05/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

05/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

05/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

05/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

05/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

05/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY DEFT GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT HIDDEN LAKE SUBDIVISION PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT HIDDEN LAKE SUBDIVISION PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $992.50 Receipt Number XX 434403

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $992.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA001170CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/30/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MURRAY DBA D M BUILDERS ANTHONY is a litigant

Latest cases where ASSOCIATION, INC., SABAL is a litigant

Latest cases where AS SERVICER FOR ASF WELLS FARG is a litigant