This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 05/11/2019 at 23:30:22 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS AMODEO, JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed an Other lawsuit against AMODEO, JOSEPH. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

AMODEO, JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVIN, DESIREE MARIA

 

Court Documents

CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

09/12/2019:CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY PLTF BANK OF AMERICA NA

06/18/2019:AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY PLTF BANK OF AMERICA NA

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING FILED BY PLTF BANK OF AMERICA NA

08/29/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING FILED BY PLTF BANK OF AMERICA NA

MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF BANK OF AMERICA NA

08/29/2019:MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF BANK OF AMERICA NA

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY PLTF BANK OF AMERICA NA

08/29/2019:AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY PLTF BANK OF AMERICA NA

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

06/18/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF BANK OF AMERICA NA

08/29/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF BANK OF AMERICA NA

AFFIDAVIT FILED BY PLTF BANK OF AMERICA NA

08/29/2019:AFFIDAVIT FILED BY PLTF BANK OF AMERICA NA

DEFAULT ENTERED

06/19/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED

EFILED UNSIGNED DEFAULT

06/18/2019:EFILED UNSIGNED DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JOSEPH AMODEO

04/22/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JOSEPH AMODEO

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

04/18/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

04/18/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

SUPPLEMENTAL NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

04/18/2019:SUPPLEMENTAL NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/18/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/18/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JOSEPH AMODEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 422536

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Case 422019CC000470CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less