This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/17/2019 at 12:36:27 (UTC).

BAIRAGDAR, AHMED AMMAR

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 BAIRAGDAR, AHMED AMMAR was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAGGS, ANN MELINDA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CRAGGS, ANN MELINDA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BAIRAGDAR, AHMED AMMAR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • REPORT TO BUREAU VITAL STATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Payment received: $24.00 Receipt Number XX 410352

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $24.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING ON MAR. 12, 2019 AT 9:25AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT FOR CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • MOTION- TO SET FINAL HEARING-EXPEDITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • COPY OF FLORIDA DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number XX 395801

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Case 422019DR000322DRAXXX Filed with Clerk on 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less