This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 05/24/2019 at 23:32:01 (UTC).

AUSTIN, ALISON VS GREAT LAKES AGRA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 AUSTIN, ALISON filed an Other lawsuit against GREAT LAKES AGRA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUSTIN, ALISON

Defendant

GREAT LAKES AGRA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAURATO, MICHAEL VINCENT

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR GREAT LAKES AGRA CORPORATION

07/30/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR GREAT LAKES AGRA CORPORATION

STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

09/06/2019:STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT GREAT LAKES AGRA CORPORATION

06/24/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT GREAT LAKES AGRA CORPORATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

08/21/2019:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

NOTICE OF SERVING MOTION FOR SANCTION FILED BY PLTF ALISON AUSTIN

07/30/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING MOTION FOR SANCTION FILED BY PLTF ALISON AUSTIN

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY DEFT GREAT LAKES AGRA CORPORATION

07/26/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY DEFT GREAT LAKES AGRA CORPORATION

ORDER OF DISMISSAL-WITH PREJUDICE

09/09/2019:ORDER OF DISMISSAL-WITH PREJUDICE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT GREAT LAKES AGRA CORPORATION

06/06/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT GREAT LAKES AGRA CORPORATION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY PLTF ALISON AUSTIN

05/30/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY PLTF ALISON AUSTIN

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT GREAT LAKES AGRA CORPORATION

05/30/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT GREAT LAKES AGRA CORPORATION

MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFT GREAT LAKES AGRA CORPORATION

05/30/2019:MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFT GREAT LAKES AGRA CORPORATION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF ALISON AUSTIN

05/09/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF ALISON AUSTIN

NOTICE OF FILING PLNTFS ALISON AUSTIN NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT A TO THE COMPLAINT

05/09/2019:NOTICE OF FILING PLNTFS ALISON AUSTIN NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT A TO THE COMPLAINT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLNTFS ALISON AUSTIN 1ST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DFNT

05/09/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLNTFS ALISON AUSTIN 1ST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DFNT

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

04/30/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/30/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF ALISON AUSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING PLNTFS ALISON AUSTIN NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT A TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLNTFS ALISON AUSTIN 1ST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DFNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 425914

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Case 422019CC000535CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less