This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 12:42:29 (UTC).

ASCENSION SERVICES LP VS MORGAN, ALTON

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 ASCENSION SERVICES LP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MORGAN, ALTON. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT LANDT and LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT LANDT

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASCENSION SERVICES LP

Defendant

MORGAN, ALTON

Not Classified By Court

AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO HO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN, NOAM JAY

 

Court Documents

JUDGES WORKSHEET

04/16/2019:JUDGES WORKSHEET

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLTF ASCENSION SERVICES LP

04/08/2019:AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLTF ASCENSION SERVICES LP

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF ASCENSION SERVICES LP

04/08/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF ASCENSION SERVICES LP

AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST CALCULATION FILED BY PLTF ASCENSION SERVICES LP

04/08/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST CALCULATION FILED BY PLTF ASCENSION SERVICES LP

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF ASCENSION SERVICES LP

04/08/2019:AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF ASCENSION SERVICES LP

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ALTON MORGAN

03/22/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ALTON MORGAN

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

02/08/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/08/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

02/08/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLTF ASCENSION SERVICES LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF ASCENSION SERVICES LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST CALCULATION FILED BY PLTF ASCENSION SERVICES LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF ASCENSION SERVICES LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ALTON MORGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Active Process PTC disposition on 03/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Event SC PTC scheduled on 04/16/2019 at 1230 PM - Judge ROBERT LANDT presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 400269

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Case 422019SC000642SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 2/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Event Date: 04/16/2019 12:30; Judge: LANDT, ROBERT E; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: XX COURTROOM 1A

    Read MoreRead Less