This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 07/13/2020 at 17:36:14 (UTC).

ARMSTRONG, TAMMY VS MCT TRANSPORTATION LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2020 ARMSTRONG, TAMMY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MCT TRANSPORTATION LLC. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM and HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARMSTRONG, TAMMY

Defendants

MCT TRANSPORTATION LLC

TUCKER, RICHARD

Not Classified By Court

A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSH, BRIAN WILLIAM

Defendant Attorney

SANG, ALLEN COLEMAN

 

Court Documents

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

06/02/2020:SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

05/26/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT RICHARD TUCKER

05/11/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT RICHARD TUCKER

REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF TAMMY ARMSTRONG

04/24/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF TAMMY ARMSTRONG

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF TAMMY ARMSTRONG

04/24/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF TAMMY ARMSTRONG

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

04/17/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT MCT TRANSPORTATION LLC

04/14/2020:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT MCT TRANSPORTATION LLC

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT RICHARD TUCKER

04/14/2020:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT RICHARD TUCKER

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT MCT TRANSPORTATION LLC

04/14/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT MCT TRANSPORTATION LLC

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT RICHARD TUCKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF TAMMY ARMSTRONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF TAMMY ARMSTRONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT MCT TRANSPORTATION LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT RICHARD TUCKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT MCT TRANSPORTATION LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT RICHARD TUCKER

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2020
  • DocketCase 422020CA000488CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 3/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCT Transportation, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where a Foreign Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANG, ALLEN COLEMAN