This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/21/2022 at 16:25:08 (UTC).

ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPA VS DEVEAU, JOSEPH Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against DEVEAU, JOSEPH. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPA

Defendants

MARKS, CHANZ A

DEVEAU, JOSEPH

MARKS, CHANZ

Not Classified By Court

MARKS, CHANZ AJON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATKINSON, JOHN BOND

BUSTAMANTE, TIFFANY ALEXANDRA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/23/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF FILING

12/23/2021:NOTICE OF FILING

PETITION/COMPLAINT

12/23/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

12/23/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

12/23/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/29/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/29/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLTF ARBELLA MUTUAL INSUANCE COMPANY

01/19/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLTF ARBELLA MUTUAL INSUANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT CHANZ MARKS

01/20/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT CHANZ MARKS

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR JOSEPH DEVEAU

01/21/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR JOSEPH DEVEAU

AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY FILED BY PLTF ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

02/04/2022:AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY FILED BY PLTF ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLTF ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

02/04/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLTF ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

02/11/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLTF ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY FILED BY PLTF ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR JOSEPH DEVEAU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT CHANZ MARKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLTF ARBELLA MUTUAL INSUANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number XX 702277

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA002247CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 12/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arbella Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bustamante, Tiffany A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ATKINSON, JOHN BOND