This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 07/23/2022 at 23:31:08 (UTC).

APEX ROOFING AND RESTORATION L VS STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE C

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 APEX ROOFING AND RESTORATION L filed an Other lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE C. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LANDT, ROBERT E, THOMPSON, THOMAS P III and THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LANDT, ROBERT E

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

APEX ROOFING AND RESTORATION L

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE C

Not Classified By Court

AAO GARY FEIGENBAUM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SACKS, JORDAN KARL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/30/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

06/30/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

06/30/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/30/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/30/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DIGITAL DEPOSITION

06/30/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DIGITAL DEPOSITION

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

06/30/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/01/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

07/07/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 758489

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DIGITAL DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CC000821CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 6/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less