This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 02/21/2022 at 12:26:05 (UTC).

APEX ROOFING AND RESTORATION L VS SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 APEX ROOFING AND RESTORATION L filed an Other lawsuit against SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD and LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

APEX ROOFING AND RESTORATION L

Defendant

SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

AAO CLYDE PROVIDENCE AND ELIZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SACKS, JORDAN KARL

Defendant Attorney

DIANA, THOMAS ROBERT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/06/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

12/06/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

12/06/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/06/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/06/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

12/06/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/06/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/06/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY

12/14/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY

01/03/2022:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY

01/28/2022:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 696521

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CC001618CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APEX ROOFING AND RESTORATION LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR HAZLEY, CLARK AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR HAZLEY, DEBBIE is a litigant

Latest cases where Safe Harbor Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SACKS, JORDAN KARL