This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 03/05/2019 at 12:50:15 (UTC).

AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PRODUCTS VS ACS OF CENTRAL FLORIDA LLC

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PRODUCTS filed an Other lawsuit against ACS OF CENTRAL FLORIDA LLC. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PRODUCTS

Defendant

ACS OF CENTRAL FLORIDA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN, MATTHEW RAY

 

Court Documents

CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

02/12/2019:CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

02/12/2019:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PRODUCTS INC

02/06/2019:MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PRODUCTS INC

DEFAULT ENTERED

02/04/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/31/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ACS OF CENTRAL FLORIDA LLC

01/14/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ACS OF CENTRAL FLORIDA LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/09/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

01/08/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

01/08/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/08/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PRODUCTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ACS OF CENTRAL FLORIDA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 390260

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Case 422019CC000028CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 1/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less