This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 09/19/2020 at 18:06:29 (UTC).

AMERICAN RED CROSS NATIONAL HE, ANDERSON, JOAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 AMERICAN RED CROSS NATIONAL HE, ANDERSON, JOAN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HATCHER, MARY PAVLOFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HATCHER, MARY PAVLOFF

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

KEMPF, DONNA

NICOL, BARBARA

HUMANE SOCIETY OF MARION COUNT

NEWMAN, EMILY

FRIST STEP FOOD BANK INC

SALVATION ARMY

ANDERSON, JOAN

REYNOLDS, ROBERT J

AMERICAN RED CROSS NATIONAL HE

KEMPF, FLORENCE

ASPCA

SCHOLDING, DOROTHEA ANNE

DENNIS, VIVIAN

SPCA OF OCALA

NEWMAN, WILLIAM

Decedent

SCHOLDING, DOROTHEA A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

REYNOLDS, ROBERT JOSEPH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES COMPLETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $45.00 Receipt Number XX 565104

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $45.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINTING A PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketLast Will and Testament Recorded

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number XX 559112

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCase 422020CP001527CPAXXX Filed with Clerk on 8/26/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASPCA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REYNOLDS, ROBERT JOSEPH