This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/23/2021 at 07:41:27 (UTC).

AMERICAN PRIME LLC VS MELENDEZ RAMOS, SANTA I Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 AMERICAN PRIME LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MELENDEZ RAMOS, SANTA I. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM and HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN PRIME LLC

Defendants

MELENDEZ RAMOS, SANTA I

TORRES, JULIO MANGUAL

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SANTA I MELE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JULIO MANGUA

Not Classified By Court

NATURAL OR CORPORATE WHOSE EXA

CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR A

CLAIMING UNDER ANY OF THE ABOV

RIGHT TITLE OR INTERST IN AND

CLAIMING UNDER ANY IF THE ABOV

RESPECTIVE SPOUSES HEIRS DEVIS

OTHER PERSONS CLAIMING BY THRO

HEREAFTER DESCRIBED,

UNKNOWN NATURAL PERSONS AND TH

NOW KNOWN TO BE OR ALIVE THEIR

CORPORATION OR OTHER LEGAL ENT

PERSONS AND THEIR SEVERAL UNKN

GRANTEES AND OTHER CREDITORS O

DEFENDANT AND ALL CLAIMANTS PE

AND ALL UNKNOWN NATURAL PERSON

14 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE

09/03/2021:PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

09/03/2021:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

AFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT COSTS AND INTERESTS FILED BY PLTFS ATTY

08/26/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT COSTS AND INTERESTS FILED BY PLTFS ATTY

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE

08/20/2021:NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE

NOTICE OF SALE CHECK LIST

08/12/2021:NOTICE OF SALE CHECK LIST

CLS:FORECLOSURE FINAL JUDGMENT

08/12/2021:CLS:FORECLOSURE FINAL JUDGMENT

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE FILED BY AMERICAN PRIME LLC

08/12/2021:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE FILED BY AMERICAN PRIME LLC

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/13/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING

ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING

05/12/2021:ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF FILING PLTF ATTY FILES ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE AND MORTGAGE

05/11/2021:NOTICE OF FILING PLTF ATTY FILES ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE AND MORTGAGE

NOTICE OF FILING MILITARY STATUS REPORTS PER PLTF ATTY

05/11/2021:NOTICE OF FILING MILITARY STATUS REPORTS PER PLTF ATTY

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

05/11/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES PER ALBERT J TISEO

05/11/2021:AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES PER ALBERT J TISEO

MOTION-MOTION TO ASSESS ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

05/11/2021:MOTION-MOTION TO ASSESS ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF

05/11/2021:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES PER JASON M LUCAS ESQ

05/11/2021:AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES PER JASON M LUCAS ESQ

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT

05/11/2021:AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT

DEFAULT ENTERED

04/13/2021:DEFAULT ENTERED

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/10/2021 11:00; Judge: APPLICABLE, NOT; Docket Type: ONLINE FORCLSR SALE; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER TO BE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $140.00 Receipt Number XX 670436

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $140.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT COSTS AND INTERESTS FILED BY PLTFS ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent ONLINE FORCLSR SALE scheduled on 11/10/2021 at 1100 AM - Judge NOT APPLICABLE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE CHECK LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLS:FORECLOSURE FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $440.00 Receipt Number XX 604640

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $440.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA000205CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 2/3/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less