This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/18/2023 at 21:19:44 (UTC).

AMERICAN PRIME, LLC VS HARRELL, GREGORY C Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 AMERICAN PRIME, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HARRELL, GREGORY C. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN and ROGERS, STEVEN G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

ROGERS, STEVEN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN PRIME, LLC

Defendants

HARRELL, GREGORY C

RODRIGUEZ, JULIO

PEREZ, MYRTHA DELIA VAZQUEZ

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JULIO RODRIG

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MYRTHA DELIA

THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Not Classified By Court

A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY CO

CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT OF

FLORIDA,

THEIR DEVISEES GRANTEES CREDIT

PARTIES CLIAMING BY THROUGH UN

AND ALL UNKNONW NATURAL PERSON

NOW KNOWN TO BE OR ALIVE THEIR

RESPECTIVE SPOUSES HEIRS DEVIS

OTHER CREDITORS OR OTHER PARTI

THROUGH OR UNDER THOSE UNKNOWN

PERSONS AND THEIR SEVERAL UNKN

SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST TRUSTEE

PERSONS CLAIMING BY THROUGH UN

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TISEO, ALBERT JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

LUCAS, JASON MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

10/16/2023:MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

10/16/2023:MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

10/16/2023:MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

10/16/2023:MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

10/10/2023:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED

10/04/2023:CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

10/04/2023:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

10/03/2023:CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE NOT RECORDED

10/03/2023:CERTIFICATE OF TITLE NOT RECORDED

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

10/02/2023:MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

10/02/2023:MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

10/02/2023:MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

10/02/2023:MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

09/20/2023:CERTIFICATE OF SALE

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

09/11/2023:MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

09/11/2023:MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

09/11/2023:MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

09/11/2023:MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023

DocketPayment received: $0.70 Receipt Number XX 893771

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE NOT RECORDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
73 More Docket Entries
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketFiler Selected Confidentiality Flag: . NoConfidentialInformation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $462.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketCase 422022CA002329CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/4/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less