This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/04/2022 at 22:46:24 (UTC).

American Prime, LLC VS GONZALEZ, CARMEN CARDONA Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 American Prime, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GONZALEZ, CARMEN CARDONA. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN and ROGERS, STEVEN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

ROGERS, STEVEN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Prime, LLC

Defendants

HARRELL, GREGORY C

GONZALEZ, CARMEN CARDONA

Unknown Spouse of Carmen Cardo

Not Classified By Court

A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY CO

CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT OF

FLORIDA,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TISEO, ALBERT JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/11/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/11/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

10/11/2022:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

10/11/2022:EFILED LIS PENDENS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

10/11/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

10/11/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/11/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/11/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN PRIME LLC

10/26/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN PRIME LLC

ANSWER

10/28/2022:ANSWER

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT GREGORY C HARRELL CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT OF MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

11/01/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT GREGORY C HARRELL CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT OF MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT GREGORY C HARRELL CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT OF MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN PRIME LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketFiler Selected Confidentiality Flag: . NoConfidentialInformation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number XX 788223

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA002125CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less