This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/23/2021 at 12:21:50 (UTC).

AMERICAN PRIME LLC VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 AMERICAN PRIME LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR, SCOTT, EDWARD L and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SCOTT, EDWARD L

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN PRIME LLC

Defendants

ROMAN, ALEX OMAR GONZALEZ

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALEX OMAR GO

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN

Not Classified By Court

A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY CO

HIS DEVISEES GRANTEES CREDITOR

PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UN

AND ALL UNKNOWN NATURAL PERSON

NOW KNOWN TO BE OR ALIVE THEIR

RESPECTIVE SPOUSES HEIRS DEVIS

OTHER CREDITORS OR OTHER PARTI

THROUGH OR UNDER THOSE UNKNOWN

AND THEIR SEVERAL UNKNOWN ASSI

INTEREST TRUSTEES OR ANY OTHER

THROUGH UNDER OR AGIANST ANY C

LEGAL ENTITY NAMED AS A DEFEND

PERSONS OR PARTIES NATURAL OR

EXACT STATUS IS UNKONWN CLAIMI

ABOVE NAMED OR DESCRIBED DEFEN

ARE CLAIMING TO HAVE ANT RIGHT

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TISEO, ALBERT JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED

07/15/2021:NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED

EFILED NOTICE OF ACTION

07/09/2021:EFILED NOTICE OF ACTION

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AMENDED

07/09/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AMENDED

EFILED NOTICE OF ACTION FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN PRIM LLC

06/26/2021:EFILED NOTICE OF ACTION FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN PRIM LLC

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN PRIME LLC

06/24/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN PRIME LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON ALEX OMAR GONZALEZ ROMAN

06/22/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON ALEX OMAR GONZALEZ ROMAN

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALEX OMAR GONZALEZ ROMAN

06/22/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALEX OMAR GONZALEZ ROMAN

EFILED LIS PENDENS

06/01/2021:EFILED LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/12/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

08/31/2021:DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

DEFAULT ENTERED

08/31/2021:DEFAULT ENTERED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

08/26/2021:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

EFILED UNSIGNED DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN PRIME LLC

08/24/2021:EFILED UNSIGNED DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN PRIME LLC

PROOF OF PUBLICATION- NOTICE OF ACTION

08/23/2021:PROOF OF PUBLICATION- NOTICE OF ACTION

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN PRIME LLC

08/18/2021:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN PRIME LLC

EFILED LIS PENDENS AMENDED

08/10/2021:EFILED LIS PENDENS AMENDED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON LVNV FUNDING LLC 7-29-21

07/30/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON LVNV FUNDING LLC 7-29-21

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED UNSIGNED DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN PRIME LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION- NOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN PRIME LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON LVNV FUNDING LLC 7-29-21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number XX 636664

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA000866CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less