This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/23/2021 at 14:49:40 (UTC).

AMERICAN PRIME LLC VS FUNES, BLANCA S Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 AMERICAN PRIME LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FUNES, BLANCA S. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM and HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN PRIME LLC

Defendants

MORALES, ELIAS D

FUNES, BLANCA S

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELIAS D MORA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BLANCA S FUN

Not Classified By Court

A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY CO

THEIR DEVISSEES GRANTEES CREDI

PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UN

AND ALL UNKNOWN NATURAL PERSON

NOW KNOWN TO BE OR ALIVE THEIR

RESPECTIVE SPOUSES HEIRS DEVIS

OTHER CREDITORS OR OTHER PARTI

THROUGH OR UNDER THOSE UNKNOWN

AND THEIR SEVERAL UNKNOWN NATU

THEIR SEVERAL UNKNOWN ASSIGNS

INTEREST TRUSTEES OF ANY OTHER

THROUGH UNDER OR AGIAINST ANY

LEGAL ENTITY NAMED AS A DEFEND

PERSONS OR PARTIES NATURAL OR

EXACT STATUS IS UNKNOWN CLAIMI

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TISEO, ALBERT JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

PETITION/COMPLAINT

07/07/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

09/16/2021:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN PRIME LLC

09/15/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN PRIME LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED OF UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELIAS D MORALES

08/20/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED OF UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELIAS D MORALES

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BLANCA S FUNES

08/20/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BLANCA S FUNES

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON ELIAS D MORALES

08/20/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON ELIAS D MORALES

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON BLANCA S FUNES 18 AUGUST 2021

08/20/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON BLANCA S FUNES 18 AUGUST 2021

EFILED LIS PENDENS

08/10/2021:EFILED LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/12/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/12/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/12/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/12/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

07/07/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/07/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/07/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/07/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/07/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

07/07/2021:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN PRIME LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED OF UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELIAS D MORALES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BLANCA S FUNES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON ELIAS D MORALES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON BLANCA S FUNES 18 AUGUST 2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
07/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $440.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021

DocketCase 422021CA001268CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 7/7/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less