This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 08/23/2022 at 10:26:38 (UTC).

ALLSTATE PROPERTY CASUALTY INS VS WHITT, DEIDRE LEA

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 ALLSTATE PROPERTY CASUALTY INS filed an Other lawsuit against WHITT, DEIDRE LEA. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COTTON, LORI and MCCUNE, R JAMES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COTTON, LORI

MCCUNE, R JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLSTATE PROPERTY CASUALTY INS

Defendant

WHITT, DEIDRE LEA

Not Classified By Court

ASO LILLIAN SULLIVAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCADIS, RALPH SAM

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/05/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW COMPLAINT

10/05/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

10/05/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW

10/05/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/05/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEIDRE LEA WHITT

10/18/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEIDRE LEA WHITT

RESPONSE FILED BY DEFT DEIDRE LEA WHITT

10/25/2021:RESPONSE FILED BY DEFT DEIDRE LEA WHITT

NOTICE-STIPULATION TO STAY ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

05/03/2022:NOTICE-STIPULATION TO STAY ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT-AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT IN PAYMENT

05/09/2022:AFFIDAVIT-AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT IN PAYMENT

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

05/17/2022:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

FINAL JUDGMENT

05/17/2022:FINAL JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF ALLSTATE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

08/02/2022:SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF ALLSTATE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF ALLSTATE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketReopen CIVIL OTHER closed on 05/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketReopened for CIVIL OTHER on 05/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT IN PAYMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketReopen Date: 05/09/2022; Reopen Close Date: 05/17/2022; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE-STIPULATION TO STAY ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED BY DEFT DEIDRE LEA WHITT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEIDRE LEA WHITT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 679403

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CC001373CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/5/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcadis, Ralph S