This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/22/2022 at 22:33:34 (UTC).

AKHTER, TANY Et Al VS AXOGEN CORPORATION Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 AKHTER, TANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AXOGEN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN and ROGERS, STEVEN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

ROGERS, STEVEN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AKHTER, TANY

RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD

Defendants

AXOGEN CORPORATION

JUENGER, MARC

Not Classified By Court

DBA AXOGEN INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINSON, HEATHER L.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/28/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/28/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/28/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

04/28/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/28/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/28/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

04/28/2022:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

04/28/2022:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/28/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

EFILED SUMMONS

04/28/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/28/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number XX 739863

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA000826CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AXOGEN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEATHER ATKINSON