This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/23/2021 at 14:54:17 (UTC).

ACCEPTANCE LLC Et Al VS 5T WEALTH PARTNERS Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 ACCEPTANCE LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 5T WEALTH PARTNERS. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM and HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Defendants

NEWMAN, WEBLYN

MARCO POLO BUILDERS

FERNANDEZ, JUAN

NUNEZ, JAVIER GONZALEZ

SUTHERLAND, SHIRLEY

HUGHES, EDITH

HUGHES, KATHERINE

HUGHES, ROBERT E

RAEBUCK, MAE

CONRAD, MICHAEL

CONRAD, KAREN

DELTONA CORPORATION

JUANDA J. DIMMONS

PINETTE, ANNE MARIE

KLAERNER, PETER J

83 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SPARROW, JIMMIE

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF AD LITEM

09/20/2021:ANSWER OF AD LITEM

AFFIDAVIT OF AD LITEM

09/20/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF AD LITEM

MOTION-MOTION TO APPOINT AD LITEM FILED BY PLTF

09/16/2021:MOTION-MOTION TO APPOINT AD LITEM FILED BY PLTF

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

09/16/2021:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON ESTATE OF THOMAS L WOODEN

09/16/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON ESTATE OF THOMAS L WOODEN

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON SHIRLEY STODGHILL

09/16/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON SHIRLEY STODGHILL

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON PLAN B DEVELOPMENT LLC

09/16/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON PLAN B DEVELOPMENT LLC

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON ESTATE OF MARVIN JUSTIANO

09/16/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON ESTATE OF MARVIN JUSTIANO

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON MARION COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

09/16/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON MARION COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON MARION COUNTY CODE ENFORCEMENT

09/16/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON MARION COUNTY CODE ENFORCEMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON MARCO POLO BUILDERS

09/16/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON MARCO POLO BUILDERS

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GASPER LUPO AS TRUSTEE OF G LUPO REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST

09/16/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GASPER LUPO AS TRUSTEE OF G LUPO REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON JMS REALTY

09/16/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON JMS REALTY

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON ELIZABETH ECKENROTH

09/16/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON ELIZABETH ECKENROTH

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON ERIC ECKENROTH

09/16/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON ERIC ECKENROTH

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON DELTONA CORPORATION

09/16/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON DELTONA CORPORATION

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON CROSS AND ASSOCIATES BUILDERS INC

09/16/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON CROSS AND ASSOCIATES BUILDERS INC

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT

09/16/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION-MOTION TO APPOINT AD LITEM FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON ESTATE OF THOMAS L WOODEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON SHIRLEY STODGHILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON PLAN B DEVELOPMENT LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON ESTATE OF MARVIN JUSTIANO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON MARION COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON MARION COUNTY CODE ENFORCEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $80.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $622.50 Receipt Number XX 653051

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $622.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA001264CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 7/6/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less