This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 05/16/2019 at 21:31:42 (UTC).

21ST CENTURY FINANCIAL LLC VS GUTHRIE, CHRYSTAL MARIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2019 21ST CENTURY FINANCIAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GUTHRIE, CHRYSTAL MARIA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

21ST CENTURY FINANCIAL LLC

Defendants

GUTHRIE, CHRYSTAL MARIA

MCKINNEY, FRANK H II

 

Court Documents

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/22/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

04/22/2019:EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

RESIDENTIAL LEASE

04/22/2019:RESIDENTIAL LEASE

EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

04/22/2019:EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- EMAIL

04/22/2019:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- EMAIL

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

04/22/2019:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

04/23/2019:CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT CHRYSTAL MARIA GUTHRIE

05/13/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT CHRYSTAL MARIA GUTHRIE

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT FRANK H MCKINNEY

05/13/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT FRANK H MCKINNEY

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT FRANK MCKINNCY

05/14/2019:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT FRANK MCKINNCY

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

08/02/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AND OTHER RELIEF

08/02/2019:CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AND OTHER RELIEF

MOTION- MOTION FILED PLTF

07/29/2019:MOTION- MOTION FILED PLTF

ORDER DENYING MOTION DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS

05/23/2019:ORDER DENYING MOTION DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS

WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON DEFT CHRYSTAL MARIA GUTHRIE

08/09/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON DEFT CHRYSTAL MARIA GUTHRIE

WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON DEFT CHRYSTAL MARIA GUTHRIE

08/09/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON DEFT CHRYSTAL MARIA GUTHRIE

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT FRANK MCKINNCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Payment received: $0.15 Receipt Number XX 430335

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Assessment 4 assessed at sum $0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT FRANK H MCKINNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT CHRYSTAL MARIA GUTHRIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESIDENTIAL LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Payment received: $219.00 Receipt Number XX 423133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Case 422019SC001998SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 21ST CENTURY FINANCIAL INC is a litigant